GA HB8 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Effective Date 2021-11-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Effective Date 2021-11-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to reconstitute and reestablish the board of elections and registration for Floyd County, Georgia; to provide for the powers and duties of the board; to provide for the appointment, resignation, and removal of its members; to provide for meetings and special meetings of the board; to provide an administrative office for elections and registrations; to staff such office with an elections supervisor, clerical assistants, and other employees; to provide compensation for administrative personnel and members of the board; to provide definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide a contingent effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Floyd County; Board of Elections and Registration; reconstitute and reestablish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #14 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - Local Calendar Without Hb 10: House Vote #11 (Y: 150 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - Local Calendar Without Hb 10: House Vote #11 (Y: 150 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | Effective Date 2021-11-19 | |
2021-11-19 | Act 2EX | |
2021-11-19 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-11-19 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-11-15 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2021-11-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-11-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-11-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-11-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-11-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-11-08 | House | House Hopper |