GA SB19 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, so as to provide for collection of passport application and processing fees by clerks of superior courts and probate court judges; to provide for written report disclosures; to provide for use of such fees; to provide for local Acts; to provide for applicability to judges of probate courts; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; collection of passport application and processing fees by clerks of superior courts and probate court judges; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #668 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #675 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #98 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Adoption Of The Amendment By The Sen From The 28th As Amended: Senate Vote #97 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Adoption Of Amend #1a By Sen From The 28th To Amend #1 By Sen From The 28th: Senate Vote #96 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #675 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #98 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Adoption Of The Amendment By The Sen From The 28th As Amended: Senate Vote #97 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Adoption Of Amend #1a By Sen From The 28th To Amend #1 By Sen From The 28th: Senate Vote #96 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 603 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |