GA SB310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide for the regulation of certain professions; to change certain provisions relating to certain boxing, wrestling, and martial art associations and federations; to revise a definition; to change the applicability of certain provisions as to matches, contests, or exhibitions; to provide for the profession of professional structural engineer; to provide for definitions; to provide for continuing education requirements; to provide for unlawful practices; to provide for the issuance of certificates of registration for such professionals; to provide for registration by comity; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions; regulations; provide; certain boxing, wrestling, and martial arts associations and federations; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - House - House Vote #679 (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #480 (Y: 46 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #480 (Y: 46 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-04 | Act 561 | |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |