GA SB313 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 64 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to regulation and licensure of pharmacy benefits managers, so as to provide extensive revisions regarding pharmacy benefits managers; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers; regulation and licensure; extensive revisions; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #720 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Vote #685 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #536 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #537 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Vote #685 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #536 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #537 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 584 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |