GA SB354 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Toombs County, approved February 13, 1959 (Ga. L. 1959, p. 2010), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 23, 1977 (Ga. L. 1977, p. 3927), and an Act approved April 28, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 3808), so as to reconstitute the board of commissioners; to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for election and terms of office of subsequent members; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Toombs County; reconstitute the board of commissioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #866 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #743 - Local Calendar (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 28 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #638 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #743 - Local Calendar (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 28 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #638 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-05 | Act 460 | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Read and Referred |