GA SB410 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 5 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to equipment of law enforcement and emergency vehicles, so as to designate ambulances as emergency vehicles and exclude ambulance providers from certain permit requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles; designate ambulances as emergency vehicles; exclude certain ambulance providers from certain permit requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 363 | |
2010-05-20 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred |