GA SB434 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 700
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 700
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Glascock County; to provide for its powers and duties; to provide for definitions; to provide for the composition of the board and the selection, qualifications, terms, and removal of members; to provide for a supervisor of elections; to provide for vacancies; to provide for certification; to provide for oaths and privileges; to provide for the conduct of primaries and elections; to authorize the conduct of municipal elections; to allow for joint primaries; to provide for meetings; to authorize expenditure of public funds; to provide compensation for board members and staff; to provide for offices, supplies, and other materials; to provide for the transfer of powers, duties, facilities, and personal property; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Glascock County; board of elections and registration; create
Sponsors
Sen. Max Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #482 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #474 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #474 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 700 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-02-15 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |