GA SB512 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 21 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to payment and disposition of fines and forfeitures, so as to create the Victims of Human Trafficking Fund and the Victims of Human Trafficking Fund Commission; to amend Code Section 16-6-13.3 of the O.C.G.A., relating to civil forfeiture of proceeds and property, so as to provide for the forfeiture of proceeds or money which is used, intended for use, used in any manner to facilitate, or derived from the criminal offense of trafficking of persons for labor or sexual servitude; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Victims of Human Trafficking Fund and the Victims of Human Trafficking Fund Commission; create
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jason Esteves [D] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] | Sen. Josh McLaurin [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Rep. Tyler Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #824 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #588 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #588 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |