GA SB542 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to water rights, so as to remove references to the public trust doctrine; to provide legislative findings relative to the public's right to use navigable streams; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Water Rights; the public trust doctrine; remove references
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #823 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #597 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #597 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |