HI HB1747 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a police officer to cause to be towed a motor vehicle if the operator is arrested or cited for certain intoxicant-related offenses. Provides exceptions. Provides notice and hearing requirements. (HB1747 CD1)
Title
Motor Vehicles; Violations; Towing; Driving Under the Influence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1333). |
2016-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1333). |
2016-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 55-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 55-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Nishihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Rhoads, Takayama, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 2:30PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Takayama, Tupola. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Nishihara, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3574) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-06-16 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-05-16 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3059) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, English, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kidani, Slom. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 218). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 336-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |