HI HB1946 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a three-year pilot program in the Department of Health for hiring process improvement. Requires a report to the Legislature. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 7/1/2491. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Process Improvement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3264) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-19-24 3:00PM; CR 225. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 267). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Lamosao, Pierick voting no (6) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kahaloa, Poepoe, Alcos; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Lamosao; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 103-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |