HI HB1968 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the time period by which a civil action for childhood sexual abuse committed on or after July 1, 2024, may be initiated. Authorizes a court to require personnel of legal entities to undergo training on trauma-informed response. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Sexual Abuse Of Minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-24 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 272). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 938-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 91-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ichiyama. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-01-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2601 (Same As) 2024-05-02 - Enrolled to Governor.