HI HB2065 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the appropriation for fiscal year 2024-2025 for the Noise Traffic Pilot Program of the Department of Transportation. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Excessive Noise.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 290). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kila voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 968-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kila voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 338-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kila; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2889 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.