HI HB2589 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 218, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 218, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Transportation under certain conditions to designate shoulders upon which the Department may authorize the driving of motorcycles. Takes effect on 1/1/2019. Repeals on 12/31/2020. (HB2589 CD1)
Title
Relating To Motorcycles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 218, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). |
2018-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 218, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). |
2018-06-25 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-18 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) K. Rhoads. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 79-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 79-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 3:30 pm in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Taniguchi, Espero Co-Chairs; Gabbard. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 747) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) K. Rhoads). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3595) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3141) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 358). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1087-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 367-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |