HI HB417 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 271, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1377).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 271, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1377).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Addresses primary care physician shortages by appropriating funds for the interdisciplinary Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Primary Care Training Program at Hilo Medical Center. Appropriation. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB417 CD1)
Title
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation; Primary Care Training Program ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act 271, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1377). |
2013-07-09 | House | Act 271, on 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1377). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Kahele, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Onishi, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair; Senator Kahele replaced Senator(s) Solomon as conferee(s). |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ruderman, Solomon, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Onishi, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 492) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-13 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 216). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 373) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13 at 10:30AM. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |