HI SB2329 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for mullet production for fishponds and stock enhancement, including for new positions, equipment, maintenance, and operating costs. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Aquaculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:30PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 3:30PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 9:15AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 770). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Inouye, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Kila Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Ward. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 659). |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1788-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1189-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 103) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2811) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2385) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-24 2:15PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2631 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3