HI SB2384 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 168, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 168, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Education to develop a comprehensive plan to integrate design thinking and coding in middle, intermediate, and high school curriculums. Requires that any such plan developed by the Department of Education, including any proposed legislation, be submitted to the Legislature prior to the 2019 Regular Session. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 168, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 168, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 138-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 138-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen, Hashem, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Shimabukuro, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 1:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-18 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashem, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 555). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 409). |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1818-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 168). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2793) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2096) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |