HI SB2630 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act 227, 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Act 227, 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Hawaii Correctional Industries to sell inmate-made products and services on the open market to the general public. Repeals the prohibition of the sale of such products on the open market. Requires Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to conduct a feasibility study on establishing a reentry academy for training and entrepreneurial resources (RAFTER). Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Corrections; Committed Persons; Sale of Crafts; Correctional Industries Program; Reentry Academy for Training and Entrepreneurial Resources; RAFTER; Study; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | Senate | Act 227, 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2016-07-08 | House | Act 227, on 07/07/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 41-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 41-16). |
2016-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 3:00PM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 3:00PM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Yamashita Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Ward. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403). |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1466-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Onishi voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3). |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-17-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 214) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2797) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2066) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |