HI SB2731 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 237, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 237, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that developers of certain projects are subject to school impact fees, even when the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation or a corresponding county agency participates in the development of the projects. Provides that in urban Honolulu, fee in lieu funds may be used to purchase completed construction, construct new school facilities, improve or renovate existing structures for school use, or lease land or facilities for school use. (CD1)
Title
School Impact Fees; Housing Projects; Urban Honolulu
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 237, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 237, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 80-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 80-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Luke, Ichiyama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Tokuda, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Matsumoto. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 406). |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1472-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Kong, Tupola. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 239) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2807) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-16 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2155) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-16 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |