HI SB2819 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires vehicles traveling ten miles per hour or more below the posted speed limit on a two-lane highway, behind which five vehicles are formed in a line, to pull over where possible to let the trailing vehicles pass or overtake. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Traffic Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 67-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 67-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Tarnas, Kahaloa, Takayama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, San Buenaventura, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 329. |
2024-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 329. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; San Buenaventura Co-Chair; Richards. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Takayama, Matsumoto. |
2024-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 536). |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-03-24. |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1591-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-21-24 2:05PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1121-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-12-24 10:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2942) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2345) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |