HI SB3229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a working group to identify, assess, and recommend certain risk transfer market mechanisms. Establishes requirements for insurers relating to claims for additional living expenses under homeowners insurance policies, including situations where losses are incurred during a state of emergency. Takes effect 7/1/2040. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2597) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Additional Living Expenses Coverage
Insurance Commissioner
Report
Risk Transfer Market Mechanisms
Working Group
Insurance Commissioner
Report
Risk Transfer Market Mechanisms
Working Group