HI SB3335 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, M. Mizuno, Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Chun, Garcia, Garrett, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Onishi, Pierick, Souza, Takayama, Takenouchi, Ward, Woodson voting no (23) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, M. Mizuno, Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Chun, Garcia, Garrett, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Onishi, Pierick, Souza, Takayama, Takenouchi, Ward, Woodson voting no (23) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Cannabis and Hemp Authority and Cannabis and Hemp Control Board within the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to regulate all aspects of the cannabis plant. Beginning 1/1/2026, legalizes the personal adult use of cannabis. Establishes taxes on the retail sale of adult-use cannabis and the sale of medical cannabis. Adds new traffic offenses and clarifies existing traffic offenses relating to the consumption or possession of marijuana or marijuana concentrate. Makes conforming amendments related to the legalization of personal adult use of cannabis. Establishes the Cannabis and Hemp Control Implementation Advisory Committee. Transfers the personnel and assets of the Department of Health and assets of the Department of Agriculture relating to cannabis to the Hawaii Cannabis and Hemp Authority. Establishes positions. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, M. Mizuno, Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Chun, Garcia, Garrett, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Onishi, Pierick, Souza, Takayama, Takenouchi, Ward, Woodson voting no (23) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1339-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Hashem, Onishi, Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama. |
2024-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Sayama, Takayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Chun, Garcia, Garrett, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Onishi, Pierick, Souza, Takenouchi, Ward, Woodson voting no (22) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from JHA/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1160-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takayama; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Kong, Souza; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA/AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 326) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Fukunaga, Kidani, McKelvey, Shimabukuro. Noes, 6 (Senator(s) Elefante, Fevella, Inouye, Kim, Moriwaki, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3057) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, DeCoite ; 5 No(es): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Inouye, Kidani, Wakai, Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:50AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HHS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2621) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Elefante; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, Shimabukuro ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The HHS/JDC public hearing on 02-13-24 9:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference will be on a Proposed Draft. Please refer to the amended hearing notice for additional information. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 9:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HHS/JDC, CPN/WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2600 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Adult-Use Cannabis
Appropriation
Cannabis and Hemp Control Board
Cannabis and Hemp Control Implementation Advisory Committee
DCCA
Department of Taxation
DOA
DOH
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii Cannabis and Hemp Authority
Hemp
Medical Cannabis
Appropriation
Cannabis and Hemp Control Board
Cannabis and Hemp Control Implementation Advisory Committee
DCCA
Department of Taxation
DOA
DOH
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii Cannabis and Hemp Authority
Hemp
Medical Cannabis