HI SB501 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 200, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 200, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all limited service pregnancy centers to disclose the availability of and enrollment information for reproductive health services. Defines limited service pregnancy center. Establishes privacy and disclosure requirements for individual records and information. Authorizes civil penalties and civil actions for enforcement and remedy. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 200, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 200, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (12) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Harimoto, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 156) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 156). |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Nishimoto, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Kidani, K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nishimoto, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 556). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Har, Kong, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (10) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1760) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Oshiro, McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2017-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-05-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1372) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:15AM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-17 10:15AM. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-15 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 31 |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-16-17 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kim . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Harimoto, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB663 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).