ID H0631 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to remove a provision relating to funds for Medicaid trustee and benefit expenditures; and to remove a sunset clause.
Title
Amends existing law to remove a provision relating to funds for Medicaid trustee and benefit expenditures; and to remove a sunset clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/28 | |
2012-03-28 | To Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-26 | To enrol | |
2012-03-26 | to House | |
2012-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-21 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-21 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-21 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-16 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-16 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-15 | to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-15 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2012-03-14 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-13 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-12 | to engros | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-09 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-05 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-02 | to printing | |
2012-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-02 | House intro |