ID S1150 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the circulation and signing of petitions for a ballot initiative.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the circulation and signing of petitions for a ballot initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Recommitted to State Affairs |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-05-12 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-05-12 | Senate | to enrol |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 25-7-3 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2021-05-05 | House | to Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Title apvd |
2021-05-05 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-05-05 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-20 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2021-04-19 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders, no objection |
2021-04-19 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2021-04-19 | House | Previously Read in Full |
2021-04-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 19, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-6-1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |