ID S1211 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- PERMANENT BUILDING FUND -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Administration for the Division of Public Works for fiscal year 2019.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Administration for the Division of Public Works for fiscal year 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/S1211/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/S1211.pdf |