ID S1315 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Signed by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 364 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Signed by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 364 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
FORECLOSURE - Amends existing law to provide that a purchaser at a trustee's sale shall be entitled to dispose of titled or nontitled personal property under certain conditions.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a purchaser at a trustee's sale shall be entitled to dispose of titled or nontitled personal property under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/05/16 Session Law Chapter 364 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED -- 67-0-3 |
2016-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-15 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2016-03-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-14 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |