ID S1421 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 03/31/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 03/31/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - Appropriates and transfers $2,000,000 from the General Fund to the Constitutional Defense Fund in fiscal year 2016; and appropriates $971,700 from the General Fund to the Department of Administration for the Purchasing Program for fiscal year 2016.
Title
Appropriates and transfers $2,000,000 from the General Fund to the Constitutional Defense Fund in fiscal year 2016; and appropriates $971,700 from the General Fund to the Department of Administration for the Purchasing Program for fiscal year 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 03/31/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Gibbs |
2016-03-24 | House | 53-17-0 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Shepherd, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Chew, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Jordan, King, Kloc, McCrostie, Nye, Pence, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Sims, Smith, Wintrow Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Keough |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 29-5-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Thayn, Vick, Winder NAYS -- Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Jordan, Stennett, Ward-Engelking Absent and excused -- Anthon Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |