IL HB4130 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
WATERWAY CLEANUP MONTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 025-000-000 |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | First Reading |
2023-09-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |