IL HB4412 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a child care facility may authorize the Department of Children and Family Services or a third-party vendor to collect fingerprints for the criminal background investigation. Defines "third-party vendor".
Title
CHILD CARE-BACKGROUND CHECK
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Harry Benton [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2024-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |