IL HB4666 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $40,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for the Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Professional Support Grant Program. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$DHS-MENTAL HLTH PROFESSIONALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4666&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4666.pdf |