IL HB5087 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that physical therapy through telehealth services may be used to address access issues to care, enhance care delivery, or increase the physical therapist's ability to assess and direct the patient's performance in the patient's own environment. Provides that a physical therapist or a physical therapist assistant working under the general supervision of a physical therapist may provide physical therapy through telehealth services pursuant to the terms and use defined in the Telehealth Act and the Illinois Insurance Code under specified conditions.
Title
PHYSICAL THERAPY-TELEHEALTH
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Patrick Sheehan [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Nicole La Ha [R] | Rep. Brandun Schweizer [R] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |