IL HB5164 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clerks of the Court Act. Provides that filing fees for a petition for change name may not exceed $25, and the court may waive this fee for good cause shown. Amends Name Change Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Deletes the requirement that a petitioner must reside in this State for 6 months before the petitioner may file a petition under this Article. Allows a petitioner to request that the court file be impounded if public disclosure may be a hardship and have a negative impact on the petitioner's health or safety to include, but not be limited to, if the person is transgender, an adoptee, a survivor of domestic or intimate partner abuse, a survivor of gender-based violence, a survivor of human trafficking, a refugee, has been granted special immigrant status by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Service, or has been granted asylum in this country. The petitioner may attach to the statement any supporting documents including relevant court orders. Allows the petitioner to request that his or her address be omitted from court documents if it would put the petitioner or petitioner's family at risk. Repeals the requirements to publish a notice of a petition to change a name.
Title
NAME CHANGE-PUB CHANGES-FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-039-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-004-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2024-02-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-02-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-02-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 105 | 27.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 21-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 21-103 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 21-103.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |