IL HB5258 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Removes the definition of "dependent". Amends the Health Maintenance Organization Act and the Limited Health Service Organization Act to provide that health maintenance organizations and limited health service organizations are subject to the provisions of the Illinois Insurance Code added by the amendatory Act.
Title
INS-DEPENDENT PARENT COVERAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Hoan Huynh [D] | Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |