IL SB1298 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Amends the definition of "authorized emergency vehicle" to include vehicles of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority with a gross vehicle weight rating of 9,000 pounds or more and those identified as Highway Emergency Lane Patrol (rather than vehicles of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority identified as Highway Emergency Lane Patrol). Allows vehicles of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority with a gross vehicle weight of 9,000 pounds or more to use red or white oscillating, rotating, or flashing lights. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-TOLL HIGHWAY VEH-GVWR
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] |
Rep. Christian Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-01-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 050-002-000 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-002-000 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - January 8, 2019 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-006-001 |
2019-01-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-01-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-01-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-01-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-01-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2019-01-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-01-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-12-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019 |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-11-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-08-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |