IL SB2236 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Boards Article of the School Code. Removes the repeal date for the short-term substitute teacher training program. Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. In provisions concerning short-term substitute teacher licenses, removes the June 30, 2023 expiration date for issuing short-term substitute teacher licenses. Removes the licensing fees for short-term substitute teacher, substitute teaching, and professional teaching licenses.
Title
SCH CD-SHORT-TERM SUB TEACHER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.67 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |