IN HB1011 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sale of capital asset. Allows a town to invest the proceeds received from the sale of a capital asset made after December 15, 2021, and before January 1, 2023, in the same manner as the next generation trust fund if the proceeds from the sale exceed $24,000,000 but do not exceed $26,000,000. (Under current law, a political subdivision is authorized to invest the proceeds received from the sale of certain capital assets in the same manner as the next generation trust fund only if the proceeds exceed $50,000,000.) In addition, requires the fiscal body of the town to contract with a financial institution eligible to receive public funds of a political subdivision to assist the town in its investment program.
Title
Sale of capital asset.
Sponsors
Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. Harold Slager [R] | Rep. Mike Andrade [D] |
Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Public Law 157 |
2022-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Andrade M added as coauthor |
2022-01-18 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer |
2022-01-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2022-01-13 | House | Amendment #1 (Aylesworth) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-13 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-12 | House | Representatives Olthoff and Slager added as coauthors |
2022-01-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Aylesworth |