IN HB1132 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 209
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 209
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a public utility that provides water or wastewater service may petition the utility regulatory commission for an adjustment of its basic rates and charges to allow for recovery of eligible infrastructure improvement costs. (Current law provides that only a public utility that provides water service may apply for a distribution system improvement charge.) Requires a public utility to annually reconcile the difference between its utility rate improvement adjustment revenues and infrastructure improvement costs. Repeals definitions related to distribution system improvement charges. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Infrastructure improvement costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 113202 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Utilities and Energy - Roll Call 113201 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 113202 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Utilities and Energy - Roll Call 113201 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Public Law 209 |
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 223: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added second sponsor. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-23 | House | Senator Merritt added as sponsor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-16 | House | Representative Koch added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | House | Representative Battles added as coauthor. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Utilities and Energy |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Friend. |