IN HB1336 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Loan brokers. Removes references to principal manager and principal manager license from the Indiana Code. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Loan brokers.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Borders [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Jake Teshka [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Scott Baldwin [R] | Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Public Law 89 |
2024-03-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as cosponsor |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as second sponsor |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 97: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2024-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman |
2024-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Representatives Heaton, Speedy, Teshka J added as coauthors |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2024-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Borders |