IN HB1638 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State intervention in failing schools. Changes the timeline, from six years to four years, for state intervention for a school initially placed in the lowest category or designation of school improvement after June 30, 2016. Makes various changes to the provisions relating to management of turnaround academes by special management teams. Provides that a school may not offer any item of monetary value to a student or the parent of a student in exchange for enrolling at the school. Repeals a provision relating to a correction of a disbursement of state and federal funds to the Indianapolis Public Schools for
Title
State intervention in failing schools. Changes the timeline, from six years to four years, for state intervention for a school initially placed in the lowest category or designation of school improvement after June 30, 2016. Makes various changes to the provisions relating to management of turnaround academes by special management teams. Provides that a school may not offer any item of monetary value to a student or the parent of a student in exchange for enrolling at the school. Repeals a provision relating to a correction of a disbursement of state and federal funds to the Indianapolis Public Schools for
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Pete Miller [R] |
Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Public Law 223 |
2015-05-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative McNamara removed as advisor |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Smith V removed as conferee |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative McNamara added as conferee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as conferee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senator Rogers removed as conferee |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 594: yeas 62, nays 27 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 568: yeas 27, nays 22 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Yoder, Mrvan and Miller Pete |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Kruse and Rogers |
2015-04-20 | House | House Advisors appointed: Cook, McNamara, Thompson, Rhoads, Austin, Errington and Moed |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V |
2015-04-16 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 459: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Senator Miller, Pete added as third sponsor |
2015-02-25 | House | Senator Yoder added as second sponsor |
2015-02-25 | House | Senator Kruse added as sponsor |
2015-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 66, nays 31 |
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Behning |