IN SB0066 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solvent supervised estates. Sets forth procedures for the distribution of assets in a solvent supervised estate after a final distribution has been entered in certain circumstances. Allows a distributee to distribute assets described in the decree of final distribution by filing an affidavit with the court. Provides that undistributed real property may be distributed after the estate is closed by recording certain information with the county recorder of the county in which the real property is situated. Allows a personal representative to complete distribution and delivery of all undistributed estate assets to continue for a period of 90 days after a court enters an order of discharge under certain circumstances.
Title
Solvent supervised estates.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 150 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as third author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Torr |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 6: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |