IN SB0115 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes population parameters in various statutes to reflect the population count determined under the 2010 decennial census. Specifies that changes in population parameters in legislation enacted during the 2012 regular session take effect April 1, 2012. Updates multipliers that are based on a county's population and used in determining distributions made by the department of correction to county misdemeanant funds. Substitutes names for population parameters in the following types of statutes: (1) Statutes legalizing certain actions of particular political subdivisions. (2) Statutes that have been challenged unsuccessfully as special or local legislation. (3) Statutes reserving certain powers to certain political subdivisions at the time of recodification of laws relating to political subdivisions. (4) Statutes relating to certain local taxes. Resolves a conflict in the statute that defines the classes of cities to provide that a city becomes a first class city when the city attains a population of 600,000. Allows a third class city that adopted second class city status as a result of the 2010 federal decennial census to adopt an ordinance or resolution providing for the city's legislative body to serve as the park authority and to be subject to all or part of the provisions applicable to a park authority. Makes conforming amendments. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the census data advisory committee.)
Title
Classification of political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Dorothy Landske [R] |
Sen. Connie Lawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 339: yeas 50, nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 385: yeas 92, nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Richardson, Yarde and VanDenburgh | |
2012-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Koch and Bartlett | |
2012-02-29 | Senate advisor appointed: Lawson and Broden | |
2012-02-29 | Senate conferee appointed: Landske and Arnold | |
2012-02-28 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 96, nays 1 | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment | |
2012-01-23 | Cosponsor: Rep. Richardson | |
2012-01-23 | House sponsor: Rep. Koch | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-23 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Broden added as coauthor | |
2012-01-17 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-09 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections | |
2012-01-04 | Coauthored by Senator Lanane | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senators Landske, Lawson and Arnold |