IN SB0174 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Public Law 164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Public Law 164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sentence modification. Makes a person who commits an offense before July 1, 2014, eligible for sentence modification on the same terms as a person sentenced on or after that date. Provides that a violent criminal, as defined, may file one petition for sentence modification without the consent of the prosecuting attorney if the petition is filed within 365 days of sentencing. Allows a person who is not a violent criminal to file two petitions for sentence modification without the consent of the prosecuting attorney. Allows certain offenders who committed an offense after June 30, 2014, and before May 15, 2015,
Title
Sentence modification. Makes a person who commits an offense before July 1, 2014, eligible for sentence modification on the same terms as a person sentenced on or after that date. Provides that a violent criminal, as defined, may file one petition for sentence modification without the consent of the prosecuting attorney if the petition is filed within 365 days of sentencing. Allows a person who is not a violent criminal to file two petitions for sentence modification without the consent of the prosecuting attorney. Allows certain offenders who committed an offense after June 30, 2014, and before May 15, 2015,
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. James Merritt [R] |
Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Public Law 164 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 569: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Steuerwald removed as advisor |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Frizzell removed as conferee |
2015-04-29 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as conferee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Dissent withdrawn |
2015-04-23 | House | House Advisors appointed: Steuerwald and Lawson L |
2015-04-23 | House | House Conferees appointed: Frizzell and Pierce |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Steele and Randolph |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Young R Michael and Taylor |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Concurrrence withdrawn |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 368: yeas 94, nays 2 |
2015-03-30 | House | Representatives Pierce and Steuerwald added as cosponsors |
2015-03-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Frizzell added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 46, nays 4 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Young R Michael) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Young R Michael) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |