KS HB2059 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 24, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 24, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting charitable raffle prizes of alcoholic liquor and cereal malt beverages from the Kansas liquor control act, the club and drinking establishment act and the Kansas cereal malt beverage act; amending the spirits, wine and beer distributors law regulating samples; requiring monthly remittance of gallonage taxes regarding special order shipping of wine; allowing businesses to sell cereal malt beverage by the drink on Sundays without requiring that 30% of the gross receipts of such businesses be derived from the sale of food; permitting food establishments to allow dogs in outside areas on the premises and food establishments that are microbreweries to allow dogs in outside and inside areas on the premises notwithstanding certain provisions of the Kansas food code; amending the common consumption area law to permit rather than require roads be blocked and allowing designation of such areas by signage.
Title
Exempting charitable raffle prizes of alcoholic liquor and cereal malt beverages from the Kansas liquor control act, the club and drinking establishment act and the Kansas cereal malt beverage act; amending the spirits, wine and beer distributors law regulating samples; requiring monthly remittance of gallonage taxes regarding special order shipping of wine; allowing businesses to sell cereal malt beverage by the drink on Sundays without requiring that 30% of the gross receipts of such businesses be derived from the sale of food; permitting food establishments to allow dogs in outside areas on the premises and food establishments that are microbreweries to allow dogs in outside and inside areas on the premises notwithstanding certain provisions of the Kansas food code; amending the common consumption area law to permit rather than require roads be blocked and allowing designation of such areas by signage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 11 (Y: 111 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 6 (Y: 116 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 6 (Y: 116 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 24, 2023 |
2023-04-24 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 111 Nay: 11 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 6 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Thompson, Senator Kloos and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2023-03-29 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Carpenter, W. , Representative Kessler and Representative Hoye as conferees |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Blasi was adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Blasi |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-03 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 2, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 6 |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2023-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-01-18 | House | House Introduced |