KS HB2369 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting minors' access to a tanning device.
Title
Prohibiting minors' access to a tanning device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 77 Nay: 44 (Y: 77 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-03-10 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 77 Nay: 44 |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 09, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2015-02-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-17 | House | House Introduced |