KS HB2411 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing local boards of eduction to choose which professional employees' organization to recognize as the exclusive bargaining unit for negotiations conducted under the professional negotiations act.
Title
Authorizing local boards of eduction to choose which professional employees' organization to recognize as the exclusive bargaining unit for negotiations conducted under the professional negotiations act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2021-02-22 | House | House Introduced |