KS HB2667 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the lottery operating fund, increasing transfers to the community crisis stabilization centers fund and the clubhouse model program fund of the Kansas department for aging and disability services.
Title
Concerning the lottery operating fund, increasing transfers to the community crisis stabilization centers fund and the clubhouse model program fund of the Kansas department for aging and disability services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2024-02-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | House Introduced |