KS HB2819 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2819 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Providing a sales tax exemption for exploration place, inc.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2819 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation - Providing a sales tax exemption for exploration place, inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 2 (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-03-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 2 |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Taxation |
2024-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2024-03-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2024-03-07 | House | House Introduced |