KS HB2828 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing countywide retailers' sales tax authority for Marshall county for the purpose of financing the costs of constructing or remodeling and furnishing a jail facility.
Title
Providing countywide retailers' sales tax authority for Marshall county for the purpose of financing the costs of constructing or remodeling and furnishing a jail facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 116 Nay: 2 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-04-01 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 116 Nay: 2 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2024-03-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2024-03-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2024-03-12 | House | House Introduced |