KS SB133 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Senate Hearing: Friday, March 10, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Senate Hearing: Friday, March 10, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the enforcement of donor-imposed restrictions on philanthropic gifts of endowment funds or property to charitable organizations.
Title
Providing for the enforcement of donor-imposed restrictions on philanthropic gifts of endowment funds or property to charitable organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 10, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |